+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-135
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 327
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 81
- File Number 132
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 388 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 9, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 26
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (18)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor