+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 518
- File Number 717
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4426
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 272
- File Number 464
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 147 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (10)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor