+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 32
- File Number 17
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsors (5)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor