+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-13
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 497
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 332
- File Number 525
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 240 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 139
- Yeas: 130
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (24)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor