+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 544
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 463
- House Calendar Number 271
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 208
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (23)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor