+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-67
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 552
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6559
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 40
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 15
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/13 5:00 PM
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 01/31
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 346 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
May 7, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 104 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 92
- Absent: 5
May 7, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 105
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor