+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Motion Failed JF
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 196
- File Number 334
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsors (20)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor