+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsors (4)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor