+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-33
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 460
- File Number 682
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4072
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 373
- File Number 581
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 292 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 100 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (12)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor