+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 37
- File Number 40
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor