+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 391
- File Number 621
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services