+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-55
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5419
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5422
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- In Concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 537
- File Number 729
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4248
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4576
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 4582
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 4231
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 171
- File Number 291
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (8)
May 6, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 303 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5422
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 1
May 6, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 304 PASS
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
May 5, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 302 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5419
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
April 29, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 174 HOUSE AMD D
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 91
- Absent: 10
April 29, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 171 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 85
- Absent: 15
April 29, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 8
April 29, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 172 HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 12
April 29, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 173 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 87
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor