+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 148
- File Number 241
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor