+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-187
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5485
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 577
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 331
- File Number 515
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 461 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor