+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 433
- File Number 657
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor