+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 454
- House Calendar Number 291
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce