+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- File Number 3
- House Calendar Number 34
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/20 5:00 PM
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 606
- House Calendar Number 360
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor