+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 530
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6022
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6074
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 201
- File Number 270
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR PURSUANT TO JOINT RULE 9
Type:
Primary Sponsor