+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 588
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5263
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 28
- File Number 13
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 263 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3