+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 79
- File Number 130
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor