+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-70
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 543
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Environment
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Environment
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 22
- File Number 4
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 353 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 212
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (25)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor