+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 250
- File Number 436
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations