+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 372
- File Number 580
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations