+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Recommitted to Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 165
- House Calendar Number 124
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor