+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor