+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Merged Into SB00527
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
- Vote to Reconsider
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce