+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ117ER)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (90-Y 0-N 6-A)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: AGREED TO R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 006908202
+ − Votes (8)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (90-Y 0-N 6-A)
February 9, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: AGREED TO R (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2000: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor