+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2043 is now Act 592
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Linck
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 22, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor