+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1820 is now Act 1051
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Gonzales
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 14