+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1377 is now Act 487
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Received from the House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lemons
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 12
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 11
February 27, 2017: Received from the House.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor