+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (55)
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 46 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 29, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/22/16
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB610ER)
- Enrolled
- Title replaced 16105457D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105457D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (69-Y 29-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB610H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Motion to reconsider pass by until Friday, February 19, 2016 agreed to
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by until Friday, February 19, 2016
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105457D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB610S3
- Substitute #2 by Senator Reeves agreed to 16105199D-S3
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 16105199D-S3 (Reeves)
- Substitute #1 by Senator Reeves withdrawn 16105235D-S2
- Floor substitute printed to Web only 16105235D-S2 (Reeves)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 16104859D-S1
- Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104859D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 16103528D
+ − Votes (11)
February 22, 2016: House substitute agreed to by Senate (29-Y 10-N)
February 22, 2016: House substitute agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
February 22, 2016: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N)
February 12, 2016: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
February 4, 2016: Committee substitute reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N)
January 29, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 3-N)
January 27, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor