+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0101)
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 101 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB372ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Passed House with amendments (98-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amds (20-Y 2-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 002209532-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 002209532
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
February 25, 2000: Reported from S. T. w/amds (20-Y 2-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 9, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor