+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB730ER)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB730ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 8-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 16102700D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB730E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102700D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 8, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
March 4, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Reported from Transportation with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 8-N)
February 12, 2016: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
February 1, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor