+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ816ER)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 076648402
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 076648402
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor