+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ423ER)
On March 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 028382926-E
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 028382926
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor