+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ151ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Laid on Speaker's table
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 966037613
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Unanimous consent to introduce (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Vote
February 22, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor