+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ442ER)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006573888-E
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006573888
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor