+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor