+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ713ER)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 975985432
- Consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor