+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ102ER)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 005139512
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor