+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ142ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Laid on Speaker's table
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate
- Taken up
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (40-Y 0-N)
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Presented 966020635
- Consent to introduce (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Vote
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONSENT TO INTRODUCE (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor