+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ820ER)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Received
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13103044D
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13103044D
+ − Vote
February 18, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor