+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2016 - No Amendments