+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2020 - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to