+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/14/2018 - No Amendments
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/07/2018 - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to