+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources