+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - Floor
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor