+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor