+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2017 - No Amendments
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to