+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2016 - No Amendments
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor